judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-96-00342-CV
09-96-00342-CV
11/06/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Nelson, Charles D., Sr. and Donna L. Nelson
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/09/1997Mandate Issued
06/09/1997MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
04/24/1997Order EnteredDismissed
04/16/1997Motion for Dismissal Filed
03/20/1997Brief Filed
03/06/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/06/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/07/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/05/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/06/1996Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/05/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/04/1996mediation form received from attorney
11/15/1996mediation form received from attorney
11/06/1996Statement of Facts Filed
11/06/1996Transcript Filed
11/06/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/09/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Nelson, Sr., Charles D. And DoAppellantW. Scott Golemon
State Farm Fire And Casualty CAppelleeArthur M. Glover
Trial Court Information
284th District Court
Montgomery
Honorable Olen Underwood
96-04-001342 CV