judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-96-00427-CR
08-96-00427-CR
11/06/1996
Other Drug Possession
Powell, Elton Leon
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/17/1998Mandate Issued
08/17/1998Shuck purged
08/17/1998Mandate Issued
04/30/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/30/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/03/1998Submitted
02/03/1998Submission
02/03/1998Submitted
12/30/1997Submission
11/03/1997Miscellaneous filing
08/13/1997Brief Filed
08/13/1997Case ready to be set
08/13/1997Case ready to be set
07/23/1997Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/09/1997Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
05/30/1997Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/30/1997Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
04/16/1997Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/16/1997Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
03/21/1997Brief Filed
02/24/1997Order entered
02/24/1997Sup. St. of Facts Filed
02/19/1997Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
02/19/1997Statement of Facts Filed
02/12/1997Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/06/1997Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
01/30/1997Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
12/31/1996Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/20/1996Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
12/12/1996Transcript Filed
11/06/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
11/06/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/17/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasHon. John W. Smith
POWELL, ELTON LEONCriminal - AppellantHon. G William Fowler
Hon. E. Jason Leach
Trial Court Information
161st District Court
Ector
Honorable Tryon D. Lewis
B-24,282
10 Yrs TDC + $10,000. fine