judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-96-00553-CV
13-96-00553-CV
11/06/1996
Miscellaneous civil
City of Sinton
Olivarez, Oralia M.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/22/1998Exhibits Disposed
08/10/1998Mandate Issued
07/20/1998Order Entered
07/03/1998Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
05/08/1998Petition For Review Disposed by Sup CtMotion or Writ Denied
02/02/1998Petition for Review
02/02/1998Supreme Court Number
12/18/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/23/1997Submitted
10/23/1997Submission
10/16/1997Reply Brief Filed
10/09/1997Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT
10/09/1997Submission
09/19/1997Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
09/19/1997Submission
04/01/1997Brief Filed
04/01/1997No oral argument requested
03/27/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/18/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/24/1997Case ready to be set
02/24/1997Oral argument requested
02/24/1997Brief Filed
02/20/1997Exhibits returned
02/13/1997Green card in
02/10/1997Exhibits Checked Out
02/06/1997Exhibits Filed
02/06/1997Exhibits received
01/24/1997Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
01/24/1997STATEMENT OF FACTS FILED
11/25/1996Transcript Filed
11/21/1996Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/12/1996Statement Filed
11/07/1996STATEMENT OF FACTS FILED
11/07/1996Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
11/07/1996Statement of Facts Received
11/06/1996Document Received
11/06/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/06/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/10/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City Of SintonAppellantHon. David W. Green
Olivarez, Oralia M.AppelleeHon. Rene Rodriguez
Ryan E. Stevens
Trial Court Information
343rd District Court
San Patricio
Honorable Alonzo Torres Rodriguez
S-93-5747CV-C