judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01753-CR
05-96-01753-CR
11/06/1996
Felony DWI
TEXAS, THE STATE OF
BIXBY, CHARLES
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/26/1997Mandate Issued
08/26/1997Mandate Issued
06/20/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Denied
06/20/1997Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Denied
06/20/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Denied
06/20/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
06/20/1997Order EnteredStrike
06/20/1997Order EnteredVacated
06/20/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
04/08/1997Brief Filed
04/08/1997Case ready to be set
04/08/1997MattConv
04/08/1997Case ready to be set
03/05/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/04/1997MattConv
03/03/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/07/1997Brief Filed
02/06/1997MattConv
12/11/1996Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/09/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/06/1996MattConv
11/21/1996Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/21/1996Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/21/1996Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Denied
11/18/1996Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
11/18/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/18/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/08/1996Notice Sent
11/06/1996Transcript Filed
11/06/1996Transcript Tendered
11/06/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/30/1996MattConv
10/30/1996Exhibits Filed
10/30/1996Statement of Facts Filed
10/27/1996Record due
09/05/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
08/28/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/26/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bixby, CharlesCriminal - State of Texas
Texas, The State OfCriminal - AppellantJack M. Pepper
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasMr. Jeffrey Brian Richter
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1
Collin
Honorable Weldon S. Copeland
001-81989-95