judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01748-CR
05-96-01748-CR
11/06/1996
Theft
Butterworth, Billie Jean
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/02/1998Mandate Issued
11/02/1998Mandate Issued
08/19/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/19/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/05/1998Submitted
06/05/1998Submission
06/05/1998Submitted
05/08/1998Submission
04/27/1998Brief Filed
03/24/1998Motion to Postpone DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/22/1998Letter Filed
03/19/1998Motion for Postponement
03/16/1998Submission
09/21/1997Case ready to be set
09/21/1997MattConv
09/21/1997Case ready to be set
08/28/1997MattConv
08/27/1997Brief Filed
08/18/1997Letter Filed
07/28/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/28/1997Statement of Facts Filed
07/23/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
07/17/1997MattConv
07/09/1997MattConv
06/09/1997Case reinstated
06/09/1997Case reinstated
06/06/1997Supplemental Record Due
05/22/1997Supplemental Transcript filed
04/22/1997Motion to Abate DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/22/1997Order EnteredAbated
04/22/1997Order EnteredAbated
03/14/1997Motion to Abate Filed
03/07/1997MattConv
01/23/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/21/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
01/16/1997Record due
01/16/1997Transcript Filed
11/07/1996Notice Sent
11/06/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/01/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
09/24/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
09/18/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/02/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Butterworth, Billie JeanCriminal - AppellantJoshua M. Webber
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasPatricia Poppoff Noble
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 7
Dallas
Honorable Elizabeth Crowder
MA94-30448-H
30 DYS/PROB 6 MTHS/300 FIN