judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-96-01743-CV
05-96-01743-CV
11/06/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Jones, John K., Dorothy J. Booth
Domino's Pizza, Inc., Bruce K. Ashburn
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/12/2016Order enteredDestroy
07/06/2015Letter issued by the court
03/30/2000Exhibits returned
09/16/1999Record RetentionDestroy
09/14/1999Mandate Issued
09/14/1999Mandate Issued
06/09/1999Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/07/199910.00 Fee Paid
05/05/199910.00 Fee Due
05/05/1999Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/05/1999Motion for Rehearing Tendered
04/21/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/21/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/24/1999Letter Filed
02/24/1999Submitted
02/24/1999Submission
02/24/1999Submitted
11/20/1998Letter Filed
11/19/1998Letter Filed
11/12/1998Submission
10/17/1997Letter Filed
07/29/1997MattConv
07/18/1997MattConv
05/19/1997Brief Filed
05/19/1997Case ready to be set
05/19/1997MattConv
05/19/1997Case ready to be set
04/18/1997MattConv
04/18/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/17/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/04/1997Exhibits Filed
03/24/1997Brief Filed
03/24/1997MattConv
02/15/1997MattConv
02/13/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/12/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/17/1997Record due
01/16/1997Statement of Facts Filed
01/16/1997Transcript Filed
01/13/1997Objection DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/13/1997Order EnteredVacated
12/27/1996Objection Filed
12/23/1996MattConv
12/21/1996Record due
12/16/1996ADR Referral Order IssuedReferred to Mediation
12/06/1996MattConv
11/27/1996Civil Appeals Information Sheet Filed Appellant
11/27/1996Civil Appeals Information Sheet Filed Appellee
11/21/1996Appeal Bond Due
11/07/1996MattConv
11/06/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/20/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
08/23/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/12/2016Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jones, John K. Dorothy J. BooAppellantJohn E. Collins
Domino`s Pizza, Inc., Bruce K.AppelleeKevin J. Cook
Gary W. Maxfield
Trial Court Information
160th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable David C. Godbey
94-06423-H