judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-81-00296-CR
13-81-00296-CR
10/21/1981
Burglary
Gray, John Robert
Texas, The State of
No
14th Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/1988Record checked in
09/26/1988Green card in
09/22/1988Order Entered
09/22/1988Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/08/1988Motion to Withdraw ____________ Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/17/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
177th District Court
Harris
282,804
15 years