judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1079
96-1079
11/06/1996
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
VONNA GLASS
THE HONORABLE WILLIAM R. SHAVER JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/28/1997Case Stored
01/06/1997Description of document returned to Supreme CourtNotices of 11/06/96 resent again. This time to Mr. Kenneth A. Jones, Not Kenneth H. Jones.
11/26/1996M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruledmandamus overruled
11/21/1996Description of document returned to Supreme CourtAddress updated for Mr.Kenneth H. Jones; resent notice of 11/06/96.
11/06/1996Exhibits receivedO + 2
11/06/1996Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
11/06/1996Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
04/28/1997Case StoredCase stored.1F1
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
GLASS, VONNARelatorMr. J. Edwin Price
PRCIN, DANIEL JULIUSRespondentMr. A. Kenneth Jones
Court of Appeals Information:
07-96-00300-CV
Denied
ORDER, 09-30-96
7th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
140th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable William R. Shaver
92-538,870