judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 96-1080
96-1080
11/06/1996
Granted application that originated as 130(d) mo.
MCI TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION
TEXAS UTILITIES ELECTRIC COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/15/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/14/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/13/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/1998Supplemental Brief filedRespondentrespondent's supplemental brief on expert testimony
08/31/1998Letter brief Petitioner"Petitioner's Letter Response to Respondent's Reply to Motion for leave to File Supplemental Brief"
08/17/1998Reply BriefRespondent"Resp's Reply to Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief"
08/05/1998Supplemental Brief filedPetitionerPETITIONER'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF
04/07/1998Exhibits in case/cause filedas received from COA: 11 posterboards & 1 miniature pole
12/23/1996Reply to ResponseRespondent
12/17/1996Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
12/06/1996Reply BriefPetitioner"Petitioner's response to respondent's reply to motion to publish..."
12/02/1996Reply BriefRespondent
11/25/1996Brief in Support of PetitionAppellant in casein support of motion to publish the opinion of the COA filed on behalf of MCI
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/15/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/14/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/13/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/12/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/11/1999Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive mandate date.
08/11/1999Case StoredCase location: 18-G-3 995 SW2d 647
08/11/1999Mandate issuedMandate issued; case stored.
07/06/1999Letter Filedadvising court that MCI Telecommunications Corp. will not be filing MO/RE
06/28/1999Letter Filedrec'd via fax, from Robert Gilbreath, counsel for MCI, letter to inform the Court that MCI, will not be filing a motion for rehearing.
06/16/1999Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Rehearing disposedFiling grantedM/E/T to file motion for rehearing is granted. Rehearing is due 06/28/99.
06/16/1999MOTION FOR REHEARING DUE TO BE FILEDMotion for rehearing is due 06/28/99.
06/15/1999Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for RehearingPetitioner's m/e/t to file mo/re
05/27/1999Motion to File Supplemental Brief disposedFiling grantedRespondent's motion for leave to file supplemental brief is granted.
05/27/1999Motion to File Supplemental Brief disposedFiling grantedPetitioner's motion for leave to file supplemental brief is granted.
05/27/1999Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordJudgment issued.
05/27/1999Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment affirmed in part, reversed in partCA judgment is affirmed/part, reversed/part, judgment is rendered/part. Opin by DGH w/TRP, NLH, CTE, PRO, JAB, HO, ARG. (GA not sitting.) 995 SW2d 647
05/27/1999Petition to S.Ct. to publish C.A. opinion disposeddismissed as mootPetition to publish CA opinion is dismissed as moot.
09/28/1998Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submission info.
09/28/1998Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submitted date.
09/28/1998Oral argument Roabert Gilbreath argued for pet, S.G. Johndroe, III for resp. at Baylor Law school in Waco
09/11/1998Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief filedMotion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief.
09/11/1998Supplemental Brief filedrespondent's supplemental brief on expert testimony
08/31/1998Letter brief "Petitioner's Letter Response to Respondent's Reply to Motion for leave to File Supplemental Brief"
08/31/1998Notice requesting filing fee$10.00 not paid for Pet's Letter Brief; Letter sent to Richard Valdes
08/17/1998Notice requesting filing fee$10.00 not paid for Reply to Motion for Leave to File Supp. Brief; Letter sent to S.G. Johndroe, III.
08/17/1998Reply Brief"Resp's Reply to Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief"
08/05/1998Motion for Leave to file Supplement to ApplicationM/L/F SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF
08/05/1998Supplemental Brief filedPETITIONER'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF
04/23/1998Letter Filedwith order from COA attached; Order granting request to forward exhibits Original only
04/16/1998Set for Submissionto be Argued 09/28/98, at 10:00, in the Wilford W. Naman Courtroom, Room 110, Morrison Constitutional Hall, Baylor U. School of Law, Waco, Texas
04/07/1998Exhibits in case/cause filedas received from COA: 11 posterboards & 1 miniature pole
04/07/1998Order from Lower Court filedfrom COA: ordering exhibits forwarded to our Court
04/02/1998Letter sent to parties from Supreme Court - See Remarksto Second CA, requesting exhibits
03/19/1998Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
03/19/1998Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
03/19/1998Amount of time allotted for oral argument.20/20 minutes to argue
03/19/1998Application for Writ of Error - DisposedFiling grantedGranted on Pts. 1, 5 & 6
03/19/1998Writ of error issued to Court of Appeals.
06/04/1997Case forwarded to Court
04/03/1997Notice from Counsel of a change in addressnotice of firm name correction from Richard Valdes
03/03/1997Petitioner's reply briefon behalf of MCI
12/23/1996Reply to Response
12/17/1996Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/06/1996Reply Brief"Petitioner's response to respondent's reply to motion to publish..."
12/02/1996Notice requesting filing fee$5.00 fee for reply not paid letter sent to S.G. Johndroe
12/02/1996Reply Brief
11/25/1996Brief in Support of Petitionin support of motion to publish the opinion of the COA filed on behalf of MCI
11/25/1996Notice requesting filing feefees for 90C petition and brief not paid a total of 80.00 was requested from R. Valdez
11/25/1996Petition to publish CA opinion under TRAP 90(c)MCI's petition to publish the opinion of the COA
11/08/1996APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILEDApplication due in the COA on or before 2 December, 1996
11/08/1996Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling grantedGranted to and including 2 December, 1996
11/06/1996Extension of time to file app writ err filed
11/06/1996Notice requesting filing fee$50.00 fee for 130(d) missing (called-said they would fedex)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/11/1999Case StoredCase stored.18-G-3
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
TEXAS UTILITIES ELECTRIC COMPARespondentMr. Clifton Matthew Terrell
Mr. S. G. Johndroe III
Mr. Shannon Gilbert
MCI TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP.PetitionerMr. William L. Latham
Mr. Robert B. Gilbreath
Mr. Richard A. Valdes
Court of Appeals Information:
02-95-00194-CV
Affirm
___ SW2d ___, 08-29-96
2nd Court of Appeals
Honorable SAM DAY
Trial Court Information
342nd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Robert McGrath
342-151442-93