judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONALD KENT V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1599
Short Caption:RONALD KENT V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD12253-10Filed Date:12/20/2010

Opening Event Date:12/20/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/07/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/30/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRonald Kent Y
Marco A. PalmieriNN
Matthew C. Phillips NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/20/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/04/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Marco Palmieri, Esquire, is hereby assigned as pro bono counsel to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
01/28/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
02/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (46pgs/Tape) 12/16/10 proc. w/CD
02/07/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/09/2011RECORD INDEX
02/09/2011RECORD COPIES
02/10/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/22/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/22/2011APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief.
04/12/2011APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD no oppo w/documents attached
04/21/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
04/22/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - motion to supplement record - oppo
05/02/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to Motion for Summary Affirmance
05/04/2011NOTICE RECEIVED from Appellant correcting Certificate of Service of Opposition to Appellee's Motion for Summary Affirmance
06/08/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD and the Clerk SHALL FILE the attachment to the motion as a supplemental record. It is ****MORE*****
06/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1
06/08/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED...SEE HARDCOPY It is *****MORE*****
06/08/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment on appeal IS AFFIRMED. (GLRDTE)
06/30/2011MANDATE ISSUED