judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MATTHEW WAYNE BAKER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0265)
Case Number:S-10-0265Case Docketed On:12/22/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Weston CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:MATTHEW WAYNE BAKER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MATTHEW WAYNE BAKER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMatthew Wayne Baker Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Justin A. Daraie

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing -Credit for Time Served
Opinion Number:2011 WY 53
Citation:248 P.3d 640

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/22/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/22/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/22/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/23/2010Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from appellant regarding status, and responded.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
01/05/2011Event - Other - received three copies of brief of appellant. Sent letter to appellant requesting the original and three additional copies for filing.EventOtherFinal
01/12/2011Brief - Appellant (Appellant failed to date the certificate of service, service date based on date brief signed.BriefAppellantFinal
02/18/2011Brief - Appellee Recognizing ErrorBriefAppelleeFinal
02/22/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Recognizing ErrorEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/25/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/10/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/15/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/15/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts and CD.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/15/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/22/2011Notice-Incoming - Change of address from AppellantNotice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
03/23/2011Service - Mail returned, resent to Appellant's new addressServiceMail returnedFinal
03/24/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/11/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/11/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/13/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 4/12/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal