judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GRIMALDI (TIMOTHY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33508
Short Caption:GRIMALDI (TIMOTHY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37329 , 37550 , 38109 , 43608 , 54535 , 63459
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C17442Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/26/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/23/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/23/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00492
01/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 31667, 33292, 33315, 33354, 33392, 33508, 33540, 33541, 33543, 33544. 99-00302
04/26/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 4/23/99. 99-03232
04/26/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/27/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." fn2[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted]. Nos. 30516, 33508. NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-04378
06/22/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-05427
06/22/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/08/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 30, 1999. 99-05427