judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARK VOSS and LAURA VOSS v. BEVERLY B. GOODMAN

Case Heading (S-10-0264)
Case Number:S-10-0264Case Docketed On:12/20/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Highways (Title 24)
Short Title:MARK VOSS and LAURA VOSS v. BEVERLY B. GOODMAN
Full Title:MARK VOSS and LAURA VOSS, Appellants (Defendants), v. BEVERLY B. GOODMAN, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMark VossMark Towne Voss
AppellantLaura VossLaura M. Voss
AppelleeBeverly B. GoodmanGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/20/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/20/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/28/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief (Certificate of Service corrected to reflect Electronic Service this date, instead of Hand Service on 01/31/2011)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Extend Time for Appellant's Brief. Proposed order has different due date than requested in motion, used date in motion.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/28/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Motion for Supplemental Certification of RecordNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/01/2011Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
03/01/2011Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
03/17/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal