judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: SCOTT BLOCH

Case Information: 10-BG-1537
Short Caption:IN RE: SCOTT BLOCHClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Original
Lead:10-BG-1537Consolidated: 14-BG-1347
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN173-10Filed Date:12/15/2010

Opening Event Date:12/15/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
William R. RossNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentScott Bloch N
William M. Sullivan, Jr.NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/15/2010DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the office of Bar Counsel with certified copies of documents demonstrating a guilty plea to a criminal offense by respondent. Respondent pled guilty to Criminal Contempt of Congress in violation of 2 USC Sec 192.
01/07/2011ORDER On consideration of the certified copy of respondent's guilty plea to Criminal Contempt of Congress, it is hereby ORDERED pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 10 (e), that Bar Counsel shall investigate the matter and proceed as appropriate under D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 8, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall inform the court if the matter is resolved without the necessity of further court action. (ETW)
07/11/2013FiledLetter From the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of the judgment demonstrating respondent's guilty plea to Criminal Contempt of Congress. (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
07/24/2013FiledOrder - ORDERED pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 10 (e), that Bar Counsel shall investigate the Matter and proceed as appropriate under D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 8.... (ETW)
01/05/2015FiledMotion To Consolidate case nos. 14-BG-1347 and 10-BG-1537. (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
01/05/2015FiledStatement regarding reciprocal discipline. (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
02/05/2015FiledSuspended. (TH,FE,FA)