judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

SECURITY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. EXECUTIVE CAR LEASING COMPANY OF DALLAS

Case: B-1252
B-1252
12/15/1968
Application for Writ of Error
SECURITY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
EXECUTIVE CAR LEASING COMPANY OF DALLAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/21/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/30/1968Response to PetitionRespondent
12/15/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/27/1969Response to Motion filed
01/21/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/30/1968Response to Petition
12/16/1968Document received (See Remarks)
12/15/1968Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Security Life Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Executive Car Leasing Company of DallasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information