judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9430
A-9430
01/22/1963
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
PETRONILO ESPINOSA
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/09/1963Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
05/09/1963Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/25/1963Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/25/1963Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/18/1963Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/14/1963Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/08/1963Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/31/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
01/22/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/22/1963Order from Lower Court filed
10/22/1963Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
05/09/1963Amicus Curiae Brief received
05/09/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/24/1963Opinion issued
03/25/1963Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/25/1963Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/18/1963Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/14/1963Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/08/1963Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/13/1963Document received (See Remarks)
02/13/1963Document received (See Remarks)
02/13/1963Document received (See Remarks)
01/31/1963Response to Petition
01/22/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/22/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Crenshaw, Dupree and MilamAmicus Curiae
Texas Employers Insurance AssociationPetitioner
Charles J. Lieck, Sr.Amicus Curiae
Akin, Vial, Hamilton, Koch and TubbAmicus Curiae
Jon H. TonahillAmicus Curiae
Touchstone, Barnays and JohnstonAmicus Curiae
Petronilo EspinosaRespondent
Gilliland, Davis, Bunton and McCollumAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information