judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LOVELL (GEORGE) VS. STATE C/W 35233

Case Information: 34624
Short Caption:LOVELL (GEORGE) VS. STATE C/W 35233Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:34624*, 35233 Related Case(s): 35233 , 41779 , 44217
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C140412Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/26/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/05/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07221
10/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34600, 34624, 34634, 34650, 34651, 34659, 34662. 99-09661
01/20/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 3. Mailed on 01/18/00. 00-00949
01/20/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/02/2000MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 35233 and 34624. 00-01694
02/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. On February 2, 2000, appellant filed a motion to consolidate the above appeals. We grant appellant's motion. fn1[The clerk shall modify the docket sheet in Docket No. 34624 to reflect that Sean P. Sullivan is counsel of record in the appeal.] Counsel shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file a single combined opening brief in Docket Nos. 34624 and 35233. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). A record on appeal has already been filed in Docket No. 34624. Therefore, a joint appendix is not required and the parties shall cite to the record on appeal. The parties may submit an appendix or appendices supplementing the record on appeal. Nos. 34624, 35233. 00-03058
06/29/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 30, 2000. Nos. 34624, 35233. 00-11079
06/30/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Las Vegas Drop Box 6/28/00. Nos. 34624 and 35233. 00-11188
07/27/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. Nos. 34624 & 35233. 00-13019
08/25/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 8/24/00. Nos. 34624 & 35233. 00-14967
10/26/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/21/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that the district court did not err in dismissing appellant's petition as untimely. " . . . we affirm the district court's order dismissing appellant's post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML Nos. 34624, 35233. 00-20412
12/19/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-20746
12/19/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 28, 2000. 00-20746