judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9444
A-9444
01/31/1963
Application for Writ of Error
HARRY HARRINGTON, JR., ET AL.
STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/12/1963Brief in Support of PetitionAmicus Curiae
04/09/1963Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/25/1963Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/14/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
02/01/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/08/1963Response to Motion filed
04/12/1963Brief in Support of Petition
04/09/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/25/1963Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/14/1963Response to Petition
02/01/1963Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/01/1963Document received (See Remarks)
01/31/1963Letter Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Harry Harrington, Jr., et al.Petitioner
State of TexasRespondent
Wynne, McKenzie, Jaffe and TinsleyAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information