judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-81-00822-CR
01-81-00822-CR
10/19/1981
Assault & battery
Pouncey, Richard
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/09/1985Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/21/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/12/1984Motion to withdraw and substitute counsel disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
11/15/1983No description available.
10/26/1983Order entered
02/10/1983Order entered
10/19/1981Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/09/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
177th District Court
Harris
Honorable M. A. LOVE
318,737
5 years