judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-81-00751-CR
14-81-00751-CR
10/16/1981
Auto Theft
McAfee, Carl Ulyssess
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/16/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGRANTED
05/16/1983Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGRANTED
03/21/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
01/12/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
12/13/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
11/10/1982Order Entered
09/16/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/18/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
10/16/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
10/16/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/16/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
183rd District Court
Harris
330,638
life