judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ZIGLER VS. BECHTEL

Case Information: 33490
Short Caption:ZIGLER VS. BECHTELCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A374723Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/08/1999 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/18/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Edward M. Bernstein-check no. 58716.
12/18/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00426
12/30/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00564
01/04/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings.
01/06/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing for Docketing Statement. 99-00066
01/08/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
02/05/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 3/19/99 99-00838
03/24/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 4/15/99. 99-02108
04/16/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 21, 1999. 99-03007
07/23/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 8/5/99. 99-06685
08/11/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: September 15, 1999. 99-07434
09/20/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 25, 1999. 99-08913
10/26/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 30, 1999. 99-10490
12/01/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 10, 2000. 99-11989
01/14/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 22, 2000. 00-00649
02/24/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 2, 2000. 00-02927
05/04/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-07319
05/04/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-07320
05/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NNP/CLK 00-07905
05/12/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.