judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEVI WILLIAM JOHNSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0029)
Case Number:S-09-0029Case Docketed On:02/06/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:LEVI WILLIAM JOHNSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:LEVI WILLIAM JOHNSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLevi William JohnsonKenneth Bert DeCock
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure, Search and Seizure - Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2009 WY 104, 2010 WY 47
Citation:214 P.3d 983, 228 P.3d 1306

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/06/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/06/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/06/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/11/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/11/2009Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
03/12/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant Brief and Appellant's Statement of CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/20/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/21/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/27/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/28/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/29/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/04/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Folder; Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/04/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/11/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/02/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
08/21/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order remanding for supplemental orderOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/21/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/21/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/25/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Opinion signed for 8/24/09 by agent for Warden at Wyoming State Penitentiary.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
08/31/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 8/28/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
09/15/2009Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order on remand - Supplemental order denying defendant's motion to suppress evidence.Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder on remandFinal
09/15/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal received back from district court containing new supplemental order denying defendant's motion to suppress evidence.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/29/2009Order - Supplemental briefing requestedOrderSupplemental briefing - grantFinal
10/08/2009Brief - Supplemental appellantBriefSupplemental appellantFinal
10/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Supplemental BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/30/2009Brief - Supplemental appelleeBriefSupplemental appelleeFinal
11/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Supplemental Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/10/2009Order - Following Supplemental Briefing and placing back on Expedited DocketOrderOtherFinal
04/20/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/06/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/06/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/06/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/06/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/10/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/7/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal