judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DEANDRAI JAMES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1498
Short Caption:DEANDRAI JAMES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-7005-09Filed Date:12/01/2010

Opening Event Date:12/01/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/22/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/11/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/07/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/10/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDeandrai James Y
Tonya L. FlemingYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Brandon S. Long YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/01/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/09/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Tonya Fleming, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/09/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Tonya Fleming, Esquire
01/06/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))'
03/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (5 pgs/tape) 5/4/09 proc.
03/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (6 pgs/tape) 8/4/09 proc.
03/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (7 pgs/tape) 12/15/09 proc.
03/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (7 pgs/tape) 2/16/10 proc.
03/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (10 pgs/tape) 6/16/10 proc.
03/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (73 pgs/Pirfo) 6/22/10 proc.
03/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (75 pgs/McCarn) 6/23/10 proc.
03/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (20 pgs/Pirfo) 6/24/10 proc.
03/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (10 pgs/tape) 11/4/10 proc. w/cd
03/22/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/24/2011RECORD INDEX
03/24/2011RECORD COPIES
03/24/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #10 (request for judicial action report)
03/31/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until June 6, 2011 (unopposed)
04/21/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 6, 2011. (JAC)
06/07/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (unopposed)
06/07/2011RECEIVED - Appellant's Brief and Appendix
06/10/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of the order. (Castillo)
06/10/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/attached appendix I, II & III.
07/11/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
07/11/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/08/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
09/26/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/06/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/07/2012FiledArgued before Judges Oberly, Beckwith, Reid Tonya L. Fleming, Esq. for appellant Brandon S. Long, Esq. for appellee
02/08/2012FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
03/22/2012FiledReversed And Remanded (OPINION) (Oberly and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and reid, Senior Judge.)
03/26/2012FiledMotion to issue mandate forthwith. (Appellant)Granted
04/10/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to issue the mandate forthwith.
04/10/2012FiledMandate