judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-81-00748-CR
01-81-00748-CR
10/16/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Mitchell, Garry Donald
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/30/1982No description available.
08/31/1982Opinion issued
05/15/1982Submission
04/07/1982Brief filed
04/07/1982Record filed
01/13/1982Brief filed
10/16/1981Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/30/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantMichael E. Orsak
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
Trial Court Information
240th District Court
Fort Bend
11,651
99 years