judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-81-00742-CR
01-81-00742-CR
10/16/1981
Robbery
Wilson, Ronnie Earl
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/08/1985Mandate issued - criminal or civil
12/13/1984Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
11/21/1984No description available.Refused
06/04/1984No description available.
04/19/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
01/24/1984Submitted
12/30/1983Submission
11/23/1983Brief filed
11/03/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/26/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/20/1982Brief filed
06/23/1982Supplemental transcript filed
03/03/1982Record filed
03/03/1982Record filed
09/30/1981Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/08/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
276,494
4 years