judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-81-01053-CR
05-81-01053-CR
10/16/1981
All Misdemeanors
Peters, Ricky D.
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/2018Order enteredDestroy
05/29/2018Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
05/18/1984Mandate Issued
04/26/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtMotion or Writ Granted
04/08/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/12/1982Submission
10/13/1982Brief Filed
09/23/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/15/1982Response to Motion
09/14/1982Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/18/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/16/1982Brief Filed
07/07/1982Supplemental Record Filed
05/13/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/10/1982Brief Filed
01/13/1982Brief Filed
12/18/1981Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
10/16/1981Extend Time to File RecordMotion or Writ Granted
10/16/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/06/2018Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 6
Dallas
80-58244-g
$400 fine;2yrs def.adjud