judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00336-CR
04-81-00336-CR
10/15/1981
Felony DWI
Parker, Charles Jackson
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/03/1986Case Returned from Higher Court
12/20/1985Case Forwarded to Higher Court
11/14/1983Mandate Issued
11/14/1983Mandate Issued
09/14/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/14/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/20/1983Submission
04/20/1983Submission
04/20/1983Submitted
10/15/1981Case ready to be set
10/15/1981Record Filed
10/15/1981Case ready to be set
10/15/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/14/1981Brief Filed
07/15/1981Brief Filed
06/16/1981Record Approved
04/30/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
81st Judicial District Court
Atascosa
Honorable J. T. Brite
6388
2 Years & $400.00 fine