judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00169-CV
08-81-00169-CV
10/19/1981
Contract
Youngblood, Jim, Individ. & d/b/a Youngblood Battery Outlet
El Paso Battery, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
05/12/1982Mandate Issued
03/31/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/05/1982Submitted
02/24/1982Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/24/1982Submission
02/11/1982No description available.
11/30/1981Brief Filed
11/18/1981Brief Filed
11/16/1981Filing Fee Paid
10/19/1981Deposition Filed
10/19/1981Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/12/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
Trial Court Information
171st District Court
El Paso
81-1162