judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-81-01049-CR
05-81-01049-CR
10/19/1981
Burglary of a Building
Thorn, Tony Wade
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/11/2016Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
10/31/1983Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
10/31/1983Case Returned from Higher Ct.
10/31/1983Mandate Issued
10/07/1983Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
07/01/1983Petition for discretionary review filed
06/20/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtRefused
05/19/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/28/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/13/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/16/1983Submitted
02/11/1983Submission
01/11/1983Brief Filed
11/15/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/15/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/15/1982Brief Filed
07/14/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/14/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/14/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/14/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/13/1982Clerks record filed
04/13/1982Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
03/23/1982Letter issued by the court
12/04/1981Extension of time to file reporters record filed
10/19/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/31/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Thorn, Tony WadeCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
195th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 195th District Court
F81-1062-PN
7 yrs tdc