judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00352-CV
04-81-00352-CV
10/19/1981
Contract
Terminix International, Inc., & Sears, Roebuck & Co.
Lucci, Marie
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/24/1984Original Exhibits Returned
09/24/1984Mandate Issued
09/24/1984Case Returned from Higher Court
09/24/1984Mandate Issued
09/19/1984Order EnteredMotion or Writ Denied
07/18/1984Higher Court DecisionRefused
04/19/1984Case Forwarded to Higher Court
04/13/1984Writ of Error filed
03/16/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/17/1984Response to Motion Filed
02/15/1984Motion to file Reply Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
02/08/1984Motion to file Reply Brief filed
02/02/1984Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/18/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed and Reformed
01/18/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed and Reformed
05/19/1983Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/03/1983Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
02/08/1983Submission
02/08/1983Submission
02/08/1983Submitted
12/23/1982Submission Letter Sent
11/20/1982Motion to Strike DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/04/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/03/1982Requests Oral Argument
09/03/1982Requests Oral Argument
08/31/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/31/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedFiling is Moot
08/04/1982Brief Filed
08/04/1982Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
08/04/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
08/04/1982Case ready to be set
08/02/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
07/28/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
07/07/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/24/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
06/03/1982Brief Filed
05/19/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed
05/06/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
05/03/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
04/07/1982Exhibits Filed
04/07/1982No Description Available.
03/31/1982No Description Available.
03/30/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/04/1982No Description Available.
03/04/1982No Description Available.
10/28/1981Motion to Strike Filed
10/23/1981No Description Available.
10/19/1981Deposition Filed
10/19/1981No Description Available.
10/19/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/09/1981Appeal Bond Filed
07/17/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/24/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
150th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable J. T. Brite
79-CI-14423