judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-81-00085-CR
05-81-00085-CR
10/20/1981
Aggravated Kidnapping
Garza, Sammy Conrad
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/22/1986Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
11/23/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
04/18/1980Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/27/2016Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
09/24/1987Mandate Issued
09/24/1987Mandate Issued
09/16/1987Case Returned from Higher Ct.
08/14/1987Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals
04/23/1987Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
03/25/1987Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/25/1987Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/04/1987Submission
03/04/1987Submitted
03/04/1987Submission
03/04/1987Submitted
01/30/1987MattConv
11/21/1986Brief Filed
10/27/1986Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/22/1986Brief filed - oral argument not requested
09/22/1986Supplemental Brief Filed
07/09/1986Case Returned from Higher Ct.
07/09/1986Mandate Issued
06/23/1986Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
06/20/1986Opinion issued
11/23/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
06/16/1982Petition for Discretionary Review FiledMotion or Writ Granted
05/14/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/19/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/05/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/05/1982Submitted
10/21/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/20/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
06/05/1980Clerks record filed
04/18/1980Brief filed - oral argument not requested
10/29/1979Brief Filed
08/10/1979Statement of Facts Filed
08/10/1979Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/24/1987Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable James B. Zimmermann
F78-10048-QJ
17 yrs TDC