judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00341-CR
04-81-00341-CR
10/16/1981
Robbery
Ramirez, Jr., Jesus Garza
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
08/17/1983Mandate Issued
08/17/1983Mandate Issued
06/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed and Reformed
06/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed and Reformed
06/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed and Reformed
12/08/1982Submission
12/08/1982Submitted
10/18/1982Case ready to be set
10/18/1982Case ready to be set
02/26/1982Brief Filed
01/14/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/08/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/18/1981Brief Filed
11/19/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
11/13/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
10/16/1981Record Filed
10/16/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/13/1981Record Approved
04/08/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
03/12/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
293rd Judicial District Court
Maverick
Honorable George Thurmond
2,230
Nine Years