judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TUMPKIN (MARK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 30716
Short Caption:TUMPKIN (MARK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C135326Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/09/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/10/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/10/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
07/28/1997Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Joinder of Actions/Clarification of Docket Number. (Original only.) (Nos. 30268 and 30716).
10/08/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Docket No. 30268 is a proper person appeal from the district court's oral denial of Appellant's post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Docket No. 30716 is a proper person appeal from the district court's written order denying Appellant's post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus and also denying several motions filed by Appellant. It appears that both matters are essentially appeals from the same district court order entered June 17, 1997. We direct the clerk of this court to administratively close Docket No. 30268. The clerk shall transfer to Docket No. 30716 all documents received or filed in Docket No. 30268. The appeal from the district court's order entered June 17, 1997, may proceed under Docket No. 30716. fn1[In light of our order, Appellant's request for "joinder of actions/clarification of docket number" is denied as moot]. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record of this appeal, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. fn2[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court]. Nos. 30268 and 30716.
10/08/1997Other Other. Docket No. 30268 administratively closed. All documents transferred to Docket No. 30716. Nos. 30268 and 30716.
10/08/1997Other Other. ALL DOCUMENTS IN DOCKET NO. 30268 TRANSFERRED TO DOCKET NO. 30716.
10/08/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. (Originally docketed in No. 30268 - April 14, 1997.)
10/08/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Originally docketed in No. 30268 - April 14, 1997.)
10/08/1997Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Petition of Appeal Habeas-Corpus (Post Conviction) and Motion to Enter Default Judgment for Habeas Corpus Petition (Post Conviction) denial. (Originally docketed in No. 30268 - April 16, 1997.)
10/08/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Filed Order our review of the Record on Appeal indicated that as of the date of this order the district court has not entered a written order. The district court shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, either (1) enter a written order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its order. In the event the district court enters a written order (or has already entered a written order of which we are unaware), the clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the order to this court. The clerk of this court shall add to the Record on Appeal copies of any order or other documents received from the clerk of the district court pursuant to this order. (Originally docketed in No. 30268 - April 29, 1997.)
10/08/1997Other Other. Received a certified copy of the district court Order filed June 11, 1997. (Originally docketed in No. 30268 - June 27, 1997.)
10/08/1997Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Proper Person Petition for review and appeal (original only). (Originally docketed in No. 30268 - July 9, 1997.)
10/08/1997Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Proper Person Motion for Appointment of counsel for Appeal (original only). (Originally docketed in No. 30268 - July 9, 1997.)
10/08/1997Other Other. Received Proper Person Joinder of Actions/Clarification of Docket Number. (Original only.) (Nos. 30268 and 30716.) (Originally docketed in No. 30268 - July 28, 1997.)
02/09/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2.
02/09/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/06/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Motion to Expedite Proceedings of Appeal. (Received the Original only.)
03/30/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. from the Chief Assistant Clerk of Court to the Clark County Clerk: transmit to the clerk of this court another copy of the Writ of Habeas Corpus filed in the action below on November 4, 1996.
04/04/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ. Certified Copy of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed in district court on 11/4/96. (Received in response to letter issued 3/30/00.)
07/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn6[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML
08/08/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13758
08/08/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2000. 00-13758
06/28/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Mark A. Tumpkin (appellant) regarding motion received April 17, 2001.