judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF RICK D. BODILY, AN EMPLOYEE OF JTL GROUP, INC.: RICK D. BODILY v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-11-0013)
Case Number:S-11-0013Case Docketed On:01/14/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF RICK D. BODILY, AN EMPLOYEE OF JTL GROUP, INC.: RICK D. BODILY v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF RICK D. BODILY, AN EMPLOYEE OF JTL GROUP, INC.: RICK D. BODILY, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRick D. BodilyStephenson Dow Emery
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey
Kelly Roseberry

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 149
Citation:265 P.3d 995

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/14/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/14/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/03/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Brief and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/18/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/18/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of respondent's designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/22/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/05/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/09/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/09/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/13/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/01/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/09/2011Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
11/10/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Payment of Attorney's Fees to Appellant's AttorneyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/29/2011Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
11/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/29/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/29/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/02/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 11/30/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal