judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DOWNTOWN BID SERVICES CORP. INC. V. CAROLYN L. PARKS

Case Information: 10-AA-1530
Short Caption:DOWNTOWN BID SERVICES CORP. INC. V. CAROLYN L. PARKSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES02369-10Filed Date:12/10/2010

Opening Event Date:12/10/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/16/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerDowntown Bid N
Anthony J. Marcavage NN
RespondentCarolyn L. Parks NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/10/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
12/10/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
12/13/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq.
12/22/2010 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
01/25/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/transcript
01/25/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/28/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
02/03/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL no oppo
02/18/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
02/18/2011DISMISSED
03/16/2011MANDATE ISSUED