judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CONSUMER ACTION NETWORK V. KENNETH BUTLER

Case Information: 10-AA-1531
Short Caption:CONSUMER ACTION NETWORK V. KENNETH BUTLERClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES01852-10Filed Date:12/10/2010

Opening Event Date:12/10/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/27/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/01/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/22/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/30/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerConsumer Action NetworkN
Thomas B. MartinYY
RespondentKenneth Butler NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/10/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
12/10/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
12/13/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq.
12/27/2010 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
06/27/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/transcripts.
06/27/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/30/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
08/09/2011FiledBrief (no appdx) (Petitioner)
08/18/2011FiledOrder - directing motion & appendix
09/02/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File appendix (Petitioner)Granted
09/23/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File appendix (Petitioner)
09/23/2011FiledAppendix. (Petitioner)
11/02/2011FiledOrder directing motion and brief (Respondent)
12/01/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte schedule before merits division
12/01/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/12/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/22/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Beckwith, Ferren
04/06/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Ferren, Senior Judge.)
04/30/2012FiledMandate