judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CASTILLO (ALEJANDRO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 30703
Short Caption:CASTILLO (ALEJANDRO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 23220
Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 29726
Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/09/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/09/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant.)
07/14/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
07/18/1997Other Other. Received a certified copy of the Case Appeal Statement. Filed in the district court on July 17, 1997.
08/06/1997Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement.
08/08/1997MotionFiled Motion. To file late Docketing Statement.
08/11/1997Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Granting the Motion filed August 8, 1997. The docketing statement provisionally submitted on August 6, 1997, shall be filed forthwith.
08/11/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
10/07/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to: (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. In the event the district court enters a written judgment or order (or has already entered a written judgment or order of which we are unaware), the clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment or order to the clerk of this court.
10/15/1997Order/IncomingReceived Order. Certified Copy of Order filed June 5, 1997.
01/28/1998Order/IncomingReceived Order. Certified Copy of Order filed in the district court on June 5, 1997, (copy received 10/15/97 not in correspondence file).
03/27/1998Order/IncomingReceived Order. Certified copy of Order filed in the district court on June 5, 1997, (copy received 1/28/98 not in correspondence file).
02/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Counsel for Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to serve and file the Opening Brief and Appendix. Briefing shall continue thereafter pursuant to NRAP 31.
02/28/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Regarding Order of February 9, 2000.
03/16/2000Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Motion for Leave to file belated Opening brief. (Received original and one copy - no copy returned.)
03/23/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On February 28, 2000, Picker filed a response to the order entered on February 9, 2000. This court has construed Picker's response as a motion to withdraw as counsel of record. We deny the motion. This court has determined that this appeal should be expedited and made subject to the fast track provisions of NRAP 3C. Picker shall have 10 days from the date of this order to serve and file in the district court a transcript request form or a certificate that no transcript is necessary to this appeal. Picker shall thereafter have 30 days to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. Respondent shall then have 20 days from the date of service of the fast track statement to file and serve the fast track response. No extensions of time will be granted absent extreme or unforeseeable circumstances. Failure to pursue this appeal diligently and professionally will result in the imposition of sanctions. fn4[This court has received and considered appellant's proper person motion for leave to file a belated opening brief. In light of this order, the motion is denied as moot.]
03/31/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of No Transcript.
05/02/2000MotionFiled Motion. To file late Opening Brief.
05/02/2000BriefReceived Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Hand delivered - Reno/Carson Messenger). (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 5/9/00).
05/02/2000AppendixReceived Appendix. To Appellant's Opening Brief. (RETURNED UNFILED PER ORDER 5/9/00)
05/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. However, the document provisionally submitted by Picker is not a fast track statement but an Opening Brief. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the Opening Brief and Appendix provisionally submitted on May 2, 2000. Picker shall file and serve a fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this Order. Failure to comply with the requirements of NRAP 3C and the orders of this court may result in the imposition of monetary sanctions.
05/09/2000Other Other. Returned unfiled with letter to attorney Picker: Original and three copies of Appellant's Opening Brief and the original and one copy of the Appendix.
05/16/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.
05/16/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. Appendix to Appellant's Fast Track Statement.
06/05/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.
06/05/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. Respondent's Appendix to Respondent's Fast Track Response.
08/16/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-14261
09/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14467
09/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/20/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 14, 2000. 00-14467