judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PENNY MCBRIDE, KENT MCBRIDE and HANNAH SWETT v. ROBERT DESLAURIERS

Case Heading (S-11-0012)
Case Number:S-11-0012Case Docketed On:01/13/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:PENNY MCBRIDE, KENT MCBRIDE and HANNAH SWETT v. ROBERT DESLAURIERS
Full Title:PENNY MCBRIDE, KENT MCBRIDE and HANNAH SWETT, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. ROBERT DESLAURIERS, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPenny McBrideP. Richard Meyer
Robert N. Williams
Steven Robert Dwyer
AppellantKent McBrideP. Richard Meyer
Robert N. Williams
Steven Robert Dwyer
AppellantHannah SwettP. Richard Meyer
Robert N. Williams
Steven Robert Dwyer
AppelleeRobert DesLauriersSteve A. Miller
Glenn Martin Ford
Amy Wallace Potter

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/13/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/13/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/18/2011Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
01/19/2011Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellees, received six copies of motion in mail, did not received signed original copy. Request pleading and it will be sent.EventPhone CallFinal
01/20/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Defendant Robert Deslauries' Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ThereofEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/07/2011Response/Objection - OtherResponse/ObjectionOtherFinal
02/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Plaintiffs' response to motion to dismiss and request for reliefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/23/2011Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
03/15/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal