judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

U.S. DEP'T OF TRANSPORTATION V. AMANDA C. BROADNAX

Case Information: 10-AA-1547
Short Caption:U.S. DEP'T OF TRANSPORTATION V. AMANDA C. BROADNAXClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES02246-10Filed Date:12/17/2010

Opening Event Date:12/17/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/16/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerUnited States Department of TransportationN
R. Craig LawrenceNY
Tyler J. WoodNN
RespondentAmanda C. Broadnax NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/17/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
12/17/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael Milwee, Esq.
12/27/2010 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
06/23/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
07/25/2011FiledOrder Granting PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
07/25/2011FiledDismissed
08/16/2011FiledMandate