judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KIEREN, JR. (DENNIS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36345
Short Caption:KIEREN, JR. (DENNIS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34845 , 47039 , 70801
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C137463Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/15/2002 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:01/15/2002How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/26/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/26/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-10881
06/30/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-11207
07/11/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: November 5, 1996, December 5, 1996, April 3, 1997, March 24, 1998, April 8, 1999 and August 17, 1999. To Court Reporter: James Helleso. 00-11942
07/11/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: October 19, 1999, December 1, 1999, January 26, 2000, February 2, 2000 and May 18, 2000. To Court Reporters: Patsy Smith and Renee Silvaggio. 00-11943
07/24/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Status Check/Hearing: Defendant's Motions, Wednesday, February 2, 2000, 9:00 a.m. and Defendant's Motion for New Trial, Thursday, May 18, 2000, 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 00-12778
07/26/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: October 19, 1999, December 1, 1999 and January 26, 2000. Court Reporter: Patsy K. Smith. 00-12959
07/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. Order re: Entry of Written Judgment or Order. Order due: 30 days from the date of this order. 00-12992
07/27/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: November 5, 1996, December 5, 1996, April 3, 1997, March 23, 1998, March 24, 1998, April 8, 1998 and August 17, 1999. Court Reporter: James Helleso. 00-13059
08/04/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Notice of Comliance with Order of July 26, 2000. 00-13539
08/07/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). (Amended) Transcripts requested: 12/01/99; 01/26/00; 02/02/00; and 05/18/00. Court Reporters: Patsy Smith and Renee Silvaggio. Not filed in district court. 00-13598
10/13/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Decision and Order filed in district court on 5/24/00. 00-18260
10/19/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: November 19, 2000. 00-18526
11/16/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-20085
11/20/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before December 19, 2000. 00-20324
12/19/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-22106
12/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have to and including January 4, 2001, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be permitted in the absence of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 00-22388
01/17/2001MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File a Forty Page Brief and Application for Extension of Time. 01-00995
01/18/2001MotionFiled Motion. Amended Motion for Leave to file a Forty Page Brief and Application for Extension of Time. 01-01186
01/19/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the forty-page opening brief and the appendix received on January 17, 2001. 01-01295
01/19/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. 01-00999
01/19/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 5. 01-01000
02/09/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: March 21, 2001. 01-02730
03/22/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-05075
03/23/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Respondent's answering brief shall be served and filed on or before April 3, 2001. 01-05116
04/05/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-05842
05/02/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 4, 2001. 01-07409
06/12/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-09791
06/15/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed June 12, 2001. Appellant's reply brief shall be served and filed on or before July 3, 2001. 01-10054
07/17/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-12107
07/18/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed July 17, 2001. The clerk shall file the reply brief received on July 17, 2001. 01-12178
07/18/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express Mail. 01-12108
08/02/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Errata. Notice of Errata to reply brief. 01-13059
12/04/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on January 15, 2002, at 1:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. (SNP02-CY/DA/ML)
01/02/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
01/15/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML.
02/08/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML. 02-02563
03/05/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-02738
03/05/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 7, 2002. 02-02738