judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-1235
B-1235
12/04/1968
Application for Writ of Error
R. E. MCFALL ESTATE, GUETERSLOH DEFENDANTS
FIRST STATE BANK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/28/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/28/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/30/1969Response to Brief filedPetitioner
06/23/1969Response to Brief filedRespondent
06/19/1969Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedPetitioner
06/16/1969Post submission brief filedPetitioner
06/11/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/11/1969Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/06/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
12/04/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
12/04/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/08/1974Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
02/18/1970Letter Filed
01/28/1970Dissenting opinion issued.
12/12/1969Response to Motion filed
11/28/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/28/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/12/1969Opinion issued
06/30/1969Response to Brief filed
06/23/1969Response to Brief filed
06/19/1969Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
06/16/1969Post submission brief filed
06/11/1969Reply to Response
06/11/1969Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/11/1969Miscellaneous Motion
05/14/1969Document received (See Remarks)
05/14/1969Document received (See Remarks)
05/14/1969Document received (See Remarks)
05/14/1969Document received (See Remarks)
05/14/1969Document received (See Remarks)
05/14/1969Document received (See Remarks)
01/06/1969Response to Petition
12/04/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/04/1968Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/04/1968Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Guetersloh DefendantsPetitioner
FIRST STATE BANKRespondent
Dumas, Huguenin and Boothman, McCall, Parkhurst and Vinson, Elkins, Searls and ConnallyAmicus Curiae
R. E. McFall EstatePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information