judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PRIDDY (RICHARD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 29784
Short Caption:PRIDDY (RICHARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 22587AClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/31/1996Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
12/31/1996Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
01/06/1997Other Other. Filed Request for Transcript. To Court Reporter: Statewide Reporting Service.
01/06/1997Other Other. Received Certified Copy of Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 12/31/96.
01/14/1997Other Other. Received Copy of Rough Draft Transcript. Rough Draft Transcript materials submitted by Lee Bahr on behalf of Rick Lawton was returned on this day per letter of SJ.
01/23/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
01/23/1997TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified Copy of Transcript. Court Reporter: Lee M. Bahr. Writ of Habeas Corpus/Post Conviction 11/5/96.
03/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief and appendix, or show cause why sanctions shoud not be imposed on appellant's counsel. Should appellant no longer with to pursue this appeal, counsel shall, within the same time period, file the appropriate motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal.
04/14/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Dated 21 March 2000.
05/05/2000MotionFiled Motion. To Dismiss Appeal [NRAP 42(b)].
07/10/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On May 5, 2000, appellant filed a motion to dismiss this appeal. Cause appearing, we grant appellant's motion and " . . . order this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-11652
07/10/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.