judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HAILEY JACOBSEN REMMICK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0015)
Case Number:S-11-0015Case Docketed On:01/19/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:HAILEY JACOBSEN REMMICK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:HAILEY JACOBSEN REMMICK, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantHailey Jacobsen RemmickDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Meri Vania Geringer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Speedy Trial, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 57
Citation:275 P.3d 467

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/19/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/19/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/19/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/04/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/04/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/07/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/20/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Second Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/21/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/03/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/03/2011Motion - Stay briefing - opposedMotionStay briefing - opposedFinal
06/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief and Appellant's Motion to Stay Briefing ScheduleEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/06/2011Order - Grant - third extension of time (forty-five days requested, thirty day extension - no further)OrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
06/28/2011Order - Denying Motion to Stay BriefingOrderDenyFinal
07/06/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/19/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/22/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/12/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Confidential Folder; Volume IV, Exhibits; Volume V, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/29/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Meri Geringer for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/09/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Meri V. Geringer, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/09/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/11/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/27/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/01/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 4/30/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal