Case: B-1238
B-1238
12/05/1968
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF RICHARDSON
DAVID KAPLAN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/04/1969 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
12/09/1968 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
12/05/1968 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/07/1969 | Letter Filed | | ||
03/11/1969 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
03/04/1969 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
02/19/1969 | Opinion issued | | ||
12/09/1968 | Response to Petition | | ||
12/05/1968 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
12/05/1968 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/05/1968 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/05/1968 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
12/05/1968 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
David Kaplan | Respondent | |
City of Richardson | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information