judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LONG (MARY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 30742
Short Caption:LONG (MARY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9600647AClassification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/20/1997How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/14/1997Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100.00 cash from Mary K. Long.
07/14/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
07/15/1997Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Motion for Leave to File in Proper Person. (Original and two copies - one copy returned.)
08/11/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. The clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court the original and complete trial court record of this appeal as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.]
09/05/1997Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1, 2 and 3.
09/08/1997Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Original and 2 copies.)
09/30/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On July 15, 1997, Appellant submitted a Motion to proceed in Proper Person pursuant to NRAP 46(b). On September 8, 1997, Appellant submitted an Opening Brief. We grant Appellant's motion to proceed in Proper Person for the limited purpose of filing the Opening Brief. The clerk shall forthwith file the Opening Brief submitted provisionally on September 8, 1997. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file an Answering Brief. Thereafter, this matter shall stand submitted for decision on the Record, Opening Brief, and Answering Brief.
09/30/1997BriefFiled Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: hand delivered 9/8/97).
10/28/1997MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Enlargement of Time.
10/30/1997Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Granting Motion filed October 28, 1997. The Answering Brief shall be served and filed on or before November 20, 1997.
11/20/1997BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Hand delivered 11/20/97).
11/20/1997Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/01/1998Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Representation of Respondents. Deputy Attorney General Joe Ward, Jr., in place of Deputy A.G. Marshall S. Smith.
10/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court and the decision of the hearing officer." fn1[We conclude appellant's arguments that her employer violated her constitutional rights to rivacy, due process and freedom of speech, and subjected her to discrimination, harrassmet and retaliation, are without merit.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-17341
10/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17450
10/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 2, 2000. 00-17450