judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANDRE NIGEL PENDLETON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0014)
Case Number:S-11-0014Case Docketed On:01/18/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:ANDRE NIGEL PENDLETON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ANDRE NIGEL PENDLETON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAndre Nigle Pendleton Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law
Opinion Number:2011 WY 87
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/18/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/18/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/04/2011Brief - AndersBriefAndersFinal
03/04/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/04/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
03/04/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/04/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file pro se brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/04/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw as counsel; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/04/2011Record - Received unfiled recordRecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
03/29/2011Order - Granting Permission for Court-Appointed Counsel to WithdrawOrderGrantFinal
05/17/2011Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
06/01/2011Opinion - Published order Affirming the Judgment and Sentence of the District CourtOpinionPublished orderFinal
06/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/17/2011Record - Returned unfiled record to district courtRecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
06/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/17/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/21/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/20/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal