judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FONSECA (FIDEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 29815
Short Caption:FONSECA (FIDEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 29551 , 39279 , 41207 , 42591 , 43905 , 48587
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C133562Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/05/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/09/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
01/09/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
01/23/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. To File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days.
02/04/1997Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement.
02/13/1997MotionFiled Motion. To Extend Time/Docketing Statement.
02/21/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Extending Time/Docketing Statement. The clerk shall file the docketing statement provisionally on February 4, 1997, forthwith.
02/21/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
02/21/1997Other Other. Returned, unfiled, Case Appeal Statement. (Not filed or certified by district court clerk.)
02/27/1997Other Other. Received Certified Case Appeal Statement. Filed in the district court on February 25, 1997.
05/02/1997BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 4/30/97.)
05/22/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file the appendix and, if necessary, a transcript request form. Failure to timely and properly comply with this order and this court's procedural rules may result in the imposition of sanctions against counsel.
05/23/1997MotionFiled Motion. To Consolidate, Motion to Strike Arguments B-F from Appellant Fonseca's Opening Brief and Motion to Hold Briefing Schedules in Abeyance. (Nos. 29551 and 29815).
06/04/1997MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Strike and Hold Briefing Schedule in Abeyance. Nos. 29551 and 29815.
07/10/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We deny respondent's motion to consolidate these appeals (Nos. 29551 and 29815). We deny respondent's motion to strike certain arguments in appellant Fonseca's opening brief without prejudice to respondent's right to respond to the arguments in its answering brief. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file an answering brief in Docket No. 29551 and an answering brief in docket no. 29815. (Nos. 29551 and 29815).
08/11/1997BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief (no postmark).
08/29/1997BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 8/27/97.)
09/08/1997Other Other. Filed Certified of Compliance.
02/05/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein.
02/05/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/11/1999Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. From Marquis & Aurbach re: remittiturs in these matters. Nos. 28275, 29815, 27988.
03/31/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, serve and file an appendix to the opening brief. We waive the requirement that appellant file a certificate of no transcript request pursuant to NRAP 9(a). Failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against counsel for appellant.
04/14/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix.
10/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's claims and concluded that they lack merit or are not appropriate for review on direct appeal, " . . . we affirm the judgment of the district court." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-17339
10/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17448
10/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2000. 00-17448