judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROGER GORDON V. DC ALCOHOL BEV. CONT. BD.

Case Information: 10-AA-1536
Short Caption:ROGER GORDON V. DC ALCOHOL BEV. CONT. BD.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Alcohol Beverage Control Board (ABC)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:10-251-220Filed Date:12/14/2010

Opening Event Date:12/14/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/09/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerRoger Gordon NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Alcoholic Beverage Control BoardN
Todd S. KimNY
Mary L. WilsonNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/14/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW AND MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF ********CONSTRUED AS A MOTION TO STAY LIFTING OF SUMMARY SUSPENSION LW
12/14/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
12/14/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Todd Kim, Esq.
12/15/2010PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION
12/15/2010TMC - PFR - motion for injunctive relief
12/15/2010 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND TO STAY the lifting of the summary suspension IS DENIED on the merits. See Barry v. Washington Post Co., 529 A.2d 319, 321 (DC 1987). It is *****MORE*****
12/15/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL, w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why his PFR should not be DISMISSED since petitioner lacks standing to appeal the respondent's decision since petitioner was neither a party nor particiapted in the proceedings before the Board. (FIOBFA) (rm)
12/15/2010TMC - OTSC
12/15/2010RECEIVED - District's opposition to motion for injunctive relief *******ALREADY DECIDED
12/15/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
12/16/2010RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION- to petitioner's motion for reconsideration
12/16/2010 ORDERED that PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED. (FIOB) (rm)
02/03/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/11/1/10 hearing
02/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/11/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
03/23/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF (no appendix)
03/29/2011 It appearing that the brief of petitioner was filed with this court on March 23, 2011, and it further appearing that the appendix was due to be filed on or before March 23, 2011 and has not been filed, (See D.C. App. R. 30, 31.), it is ORDERED that petitioner shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the app endix or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date the appendix is filed with this court. (JAC)
04/08/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE APPENDIX
04/08/2011RECEIVED - Petitioner's appendix (Volumes I - II)
04/27/2011 On consideration of petitioner's motion for leave to file the lodged appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that petitioner's motion is granted and the lodged appendix is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (JAC)
04/27/2011APPENDIX
05/04/2011 On further consideration of this court's 12/15/10 order which directed petitioner to show cause... it is ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL W/N 15 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this petition should not be dismissed since petitioner lacks standing to appeal since he was neither a party nor did he participate in the proceedings before the Board...(BY: ETW)
05/04/2011TMC - OTSC - respondent's motion to stay briefing - ROTSC
05/12/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until pending resolution of Court's 12/15/10 order to show cause (no oppo)
05/19/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE dated 5/4/11
07/18/2011FiledDismissed
08/09/2011FiledMandate