judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CONNORS VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36341
Short Caption:CONNORS VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A408301Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/26/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Pearson, Patton, Shea, Foley & Kurtz, P.C.--check no. 047967.
06/26/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 00-10825
06/26/2000MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Motion for Stay of District Court Proceedings pending Writ of Prohibition/Mandamus. 00-10826
06/27/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Affidavit. Due Date: 10 days
07/03/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. David Bahou and Tina Bahou Real Partys in Interests Opposition to Motion to Stay. 00-11277
07/05/2000Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. Affidavit and Verification of W. Randolph Patton. 00-11462
07/05/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. 00-11463
07/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due from the real parties in interest: 30 days from the date of this order. fn1[We deny petitioner's request for a stay.] 00-11661
07/10/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Stay. 00-11767
07/17/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On July 10, 2000, this court entered an order in this matter which in part denied petitioner's motion for a stay. In light of that order, we deny, as moot, petitioner's motion filed on July 10, 2000, seeking to withdraw the motion for a stay. 00-12270
08/08/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Opposition Brief of Real Parties in Interest. 00-13723
09/26/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. " . . . we deny the petition." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-16944
10/23/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-17022
10/23/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.