judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARTIN HULTGREN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0023)
Case Number:S-11-0023Case Docketed On:01/25/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:MARTIN HULTGREN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MARTIN HULTGREN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMartin HultgrenDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Stewart Michael Young
Joshua Beau Taylor

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2011 WY 139
Citation:261 P.3d 753

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/25/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/25/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/11/2011Brief - AndersBriefAndersFinal
03/11/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/11/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
03/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file pro se brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw as counsel; and received copy of proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/12/2011Order - Denying Permission for Court-Appointed Counsel to Withdraw and Order Requiring the Public Defender to File Merits BriefOrderDenyFinal
05/11/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/24/2011Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
06/24/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Consent and Approval for Stewart M. Young and Joshua Beau Taylor to appear on behalf of appellee; and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/30/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/13/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/26/2011Correspondence - IncomingCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
07/26/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes, Volumes I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential File, Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/26/2011Record - Returned unfiled record Juvenile 3686, In The Interest of: RAG, Minor. Not designated by either partyRecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
07/26/2011Correspondence - Outgoing re return of Juvenile recordCorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
07/26/2011Event - Hardcopy received - NoticeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/28/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card (Juvenile Record)ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
10/04/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/20/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/20/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/24/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/21/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal